THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:59:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: Virani, Sana (Used Until: 06 Oct 2024)
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1252 Lawrence Ave E
Victoria Medical Group
Unit 201
North York ON M3A 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166091100
Fax: 4166091102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sana Hassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hassam (CPSO#: 126441 )
Business Address: 201-1252 Lawrence Ave E
North York ON M3A 1C3
416-609-1100

General Information

Former Name: Virani, Sana (Used Until: 06 Oct 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1252 Lawrence Ave E
Victoria Medical Group
Unit 201
North York ON M3A 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166091100
Fax: 4166091102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sana Hassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hassam (CPSO#: 126441 )
Business Address: 201-1252 Lawrence Ave E
North York ON M3A 1C3
416-609-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANA HASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANA HASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2021