THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:27:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 457 4772
Fax: 905 457 3936
Address: 3955 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON L5M 0H1
Phone: 9056062172
Fax: 9055691890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yusra Mohammed Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mohammed Ali (CPSO#: 126483 )
Business Address: 178 John St
Brampton ON L6W 2A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 457 4772
Fax: 905 457 3936
Address: 3955 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON L5M 0H1
Phone: 9056062172
Fax: 9055691890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yusra Mohammed Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mohammed Ali (CPSO#: 126483 )
Business Address: 178 John St
Brampton ON L6W 2A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUSRA TALIB MOHAMMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED ALI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUSRA TALIB MOHAMMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMED ALI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021