THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 06 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 15 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. HAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Han (CPSO#: 126505 )
Business Address: 189 Clark Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 1T3
Business Address: 56 McNicoll Ave
North York ON M2H 2A8
4164934939

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 06 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 15 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. L. HAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Han (CPSO#: 126505 )
Business Address: 189 Clark Ave
Thornhill ON L3T 1T3
Business Address: 56 McNicoll Ave
North York ON M2H 2A8
4164934939

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 26 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LISA HAN may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology and general pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LISA HAN may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology and general pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2021