THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valentini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Valentini (CPSO#: 126750 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valentini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Valentini (CPSO#: 126750 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELE SANTINO VALENTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELE SANTINO VALENTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021