THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:36:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905.378.4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDERSON KA HO LAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lai (CPSO#: 126829 )
Business Address: E2-7555 Montrose Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
289-292-0441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905.378.4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ANDERSON KA HO LAI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lai (CPSO#: 126829 )
Business Address: E2-7555 Montrose Rd
Niagara Falls ON L2H 2E9
289-292-0441

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jul 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 29 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDERSON KA HO LAI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANDERSON KA HO LAI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 May 2021