THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 698 8676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahin Merat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merat (CPSO#: 126923 )
Business Address: 1102-8 McKee Ave
North York ON M2N 7E5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 767-7211
Fax: (807) 698 8676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Jan 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahin Merat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merat (CPSO#: 126923 )
Business Address: 1102-8 McKee Ave
North York ON M2N 7E5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2024
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHAHIN MERAT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. MERAT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MERAT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MERAT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MERAT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MERAT's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHAHIN MERAT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. MERAT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MERAT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MERAT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MERAT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MERAT's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021