THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 5-1333 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-264-4446
Fax: 4162644456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ratnavadivel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ratnavadivel (CPSO#: 126966 )
Business Address: A-255 Morningside Ave
Scarborough ON M1E 3E6
4162841020
Business Address: 5-1333 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
416-264-4446

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 5-1333 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-264-4446
Fax: 4162644456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ratnavadivel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ratnavadivel (CPSO#: 126966 )
Business Address: A-255 Morningside Ave
Scarborough ON M1E 3E6
4162841020
Business Address: 5-1333 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
416-264-4446

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKILA RATNAVADIVEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNAVADIVEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKILA RATNAVADIVEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATNAVADIVEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021