THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesiology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.O. SUEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suen (CPSO#: 127043 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesiology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Anesthesiology
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 18 Apr 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.O. SUEN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suen (CPSO#: 127043 )
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW OLIVER SUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW OLIVER SUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022