THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 West Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14162007735
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: 866-932-0037
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10b Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Phone: 5197830034
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C7
Phone: 5488893239
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taghreed Hassan Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan (CPSO#: 127135 )
Business Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Address: 80 Waterloo Avenue
CMHA Waterloo Wellington
Guelph Ontario N1H 0A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 West Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14162007735
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: 866-932-0037
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10b Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Phone: 5197830034
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3C7
Phone: 5488893239
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taghreed Hassan Medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan (CPSO#: 127135 )
Business Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Address: 80 Waterloo Avenue
CMHA Waterloo Wellington
Guelph Ontario N1H 0A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAGHREED MOHAMED MOKHTAR HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAGHREED MOHAMED MOKHTAR HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021