THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1487 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SHAZIA NABI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nabi (CPSO#: 127206 )
Business Address: 1-1487 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
9052407621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1487 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR SHAZIA NABI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nabi (CPSO#: 127206 )
Business Address: 1-1487 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
9052407621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA NABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA NABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2021