THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 14:45:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: De La Salle University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 549 6666
Extension: 3263
Fax: 613 548 1388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bagnas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bagnas (CPSO#: 127229 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
6135496666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: De La Salle University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 549 6666
Extension: 3263
Fax: 613 548 1388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bagnas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bagnas (CPSO#: 127229 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
6135496666

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Dec 2022
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARJORIE ANNE DELA CRUZ BAGNAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, Queen's University, in which Dr. BAGNAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BAGNAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BAGNAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BAGNAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. BAGNAS's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARJORIE ANNE DELA CRUZ BAGNAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, Queen's University, in which Dr. BAGNAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BAGNAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. BAGNAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. BAGNAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. BAGNAS's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: De La Salle University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2021