THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Guelph St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1H 5Z2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Delhi St
The Residency - Homewood Health Inc.
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SW Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kang (CPSO#: 127271 )
Business Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Guelph St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1H 5Z2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Delhi St
The Residency - Homewood Health Inc.
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SW Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kang (CPSO#: 127271 )
Business Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHINWOO KANG may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHINWOO KANG may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021