THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 704 Mara St
SUITE #107
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 491 5442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M A Miah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miah (CPSO#: 127312 )
Business Address: 177 Russell St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6R5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 704 Mara St
SUITE #107
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 491 5442
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M A Miah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miah (CPSO#: 127312 )
Business Address: 177 Russell St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6R5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ALAMGIR MIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ALAMGIR MIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2021