THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin College of Medical Sciences, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakerdige Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Idehen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Idehen (CPSO#: 127415 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Emergency Department
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
905-576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin College of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakerdige Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Idehen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Idehen (CPSO#: 127415 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Emergency Department
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
905-576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOSAKHARE IRUSOTA IDEHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IDEHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOSAKHARE IRUSOTA IDEHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IDEHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin College of Medical Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 11 Dec 2026