THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:00:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. PODURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Podury (CPSO#: 127437 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. PODURY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Podury (CPSO#: 127437 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Sep 2023
31 Aug 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 15 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SOUMYA PODURY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. PODURY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. PODURY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. PODURY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. PODURY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 September, 2023, and expires on 31 August, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. PODURY's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SOUMYA PODURY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. PODURY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. PODURY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. PODURY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. PODURY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 September, 2023, and expires on 31 August, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. PODURY's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2021