THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:45:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill Sleep and Lung Institute
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHAYAN MAKVANDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makvandi (CPSO#: 127466 )
Business Address: suite 205-330 Highway 7
Richmond Hill Sleep and Lung Institute
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill Sleep and Lung Institute
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 19 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHAYAN MAKVANDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makvandi (CPSO#: 127466 )
Business Address: suite 205-330 Highway 7
Richmond Hill Sleep and Lung Institute
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAYAN MAKVANDI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics, and adult and pediatric sleep medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHAYAN MAKVANDI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics, and adult and pediatric sleep medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2024