THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:28:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hassan, Sidra (Used Until: 21 Jun 2023)
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Internal Medicine/Infectious Disease
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2333
Extension: 2755
Fax: 519-740-4905
Address: Unit 5-1770 King Street East
HIVE Health Services
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2P1
Phone: (519)-780-5298
Fax: 519-780-5060
Address: 29 Young St E
Sanguen Health Center
Waterloo ON N2J 2L4
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: 519-888-6422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SIDRA HASSAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zaidi (CPSO#: 127549 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Address: 29 Young Street East
Sanguen Health Center
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
Business Address: Unit 5-1770 King Street East
HIVE Health Services
Kitchener Ontario N2H 1H5

General Information

Former Name: Hassan, Sidra (Used Until: 21 Jun 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Internal Medicine/Infectious Disease
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2333
Extension: 2755
Fax: 519-740-4905
Address: Unit 5-1770 King Street East
HIVE Health Services
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2P1
Phone: (519)-780-5298
Fax: 519-780-5060
Address: 29 Young St E
Sanguen Health Center
Waterloo ON N2J 2L4
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: 519-888-6422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SIDRA HASSAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zaidi (CPSO#: 127549 )
Business Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Address: 29 Young Street East
Sanguen Health Center
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
Business Address: Unit 5-1770 King Street East
HIVE Health Services
Kitchener Ontario N2H 1H5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SIDRA ZAIDI ZAIDI may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SIDRA ZAIDI ZAIDI may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2021