THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: Farooqi, Uzma Masood (Used Until: 07 Jan 2021)
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058203310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: UZMA FAISAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Faisal (CPSO#: 127710 )
Business Address: 1-2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Address: 1302-1011 Upper Middle Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 4L1
9058497007

General Information

Former Name: Farooqi, Uzma Masood (Used Until: 07 Jan 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058203310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: UZMA FAISAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Faisal (CPSO#: 127710 )
Business Address: 1-2575 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5K 2M6
Business Address: 1302-1011 Upper Middle Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 4L1
9058497007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA FAISAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAISAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA FAISAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAISAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021