THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:09:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-755 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058264048
Fax: 9058267201
Address: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Phone: 2898637422
Fax: 9058158988
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 29 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vagishwari Murugesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Murugesan (CPSO#: 127875 )
Business Address: 304-755 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5
9058264048
Business Address: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
2898637422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-755 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058264048
Fax: 9058267201
Address: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Phone: 2898637422
Fax: 9058158988
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 29 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vagishwari Murugesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Murugesan (CPSO#: 127875 )
Business Address: 304-755 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5
9058264048
Business Address: 401-1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
2898637422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VAGISHWARI MURUGESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGESAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VAGISHWARI MURUGESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURUGESAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2021