THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:54:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nwogbunyama, Chinyere Winifred (Used Until: 14 Oct 2024)
Medical School: Ebonyi State University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. W. Nwogbunyama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Olisama (CPSO#: 127917 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
705-360-6036
Business Address: 304 Cameron St N
Timmins ON P4N 8L4

General Information

Former Name: Nwogbunyama, Chinyere Winifred (Used Until: 14 Oct 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: Ebonyi State University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052672131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. W. Nwogbunyama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Olisama (CPSO#: 127917 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
705-360-6036
Business Address: 304 Cameron St N
Timmins ON P4N 8L4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINYERE WINIFRED OLISAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLISAMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHINYERE WINIFRED OLISAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLISAMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ebonyi State University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2021