THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169162733
Fax: (416) 916-2315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.HASSAN ZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassan Zadeh (CPSO#: 127934 )
Business Address: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2

Corporation Name: M.HASSAN ZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169162733
Fax: (416) 916-2315

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.HASSAN ZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassan Zadeh (CPSO#: 127934 )
Business Address: 6023 Yonge St
North York ON M2M 3W2

Corporation Name: M.HASSAN ZADEH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANIZHEH HASSAN ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN ZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANIZHEH HASSAN ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN ZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021