THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:43:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 480, 271 Frances Street
Wingham Medical Associates
Family Medicine
Wingham ON N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-357-3915
Fax: 519-357-1568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mousa Medicine Professional Corporation.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mousa (CPSO#: 128041 )
Business Address: 2 Crawford St
271 Frances Street
Wingham, Ontario N0G 2 W0
Wingham ON N0G 2W0
519-357-3915

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 480, 271 Frances Street
Wingham Medical Associates
Family Medicine
Wingham ON N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-357-3915
Fax: 519-357-1568

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Mousa Medicine Professional Corporation.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mousa (CPSO#: 128041 )
Business Address: 2 Crawford St
271 Frances Street
Wingham, Ontario N0G 2 W0
Wingham ON N0G 2W0
519-357-3915

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
01 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from November 2, 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mahrous Mousa in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mousa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. MAHROUS MOUSA
(“Dr. Mousa”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Mousa, certificate of registration number 128041, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that after receiving information about my emergency medicine practice, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-429476-B9H1M9 (the “Investigation”).

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake that I will not practice Emergency Medicine.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Mousa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was commenced into Dr. Mousa’s emergency medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Mousa agreed to no longer practice emergency medicine.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Mousa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from November 2, 2023, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mahrous Mousa in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mousa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. MAHROUS MOUSA
(“Dr. Mousa”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Mousa, certificate of registration number 128041, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that after receiving information about my emergency medicine practice, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-429476-B9H1M9 (the “Investigation”).

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake that I will not practice Emergency Medicine.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Mousa, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Mousa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Mousa, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was commenced into Dr. Mousa’s emergency medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Mousa agreed to no longer practice emergency medicine.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Mousa, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Nov 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mahrous Mousa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2023:
 
A College investigation was commenced into Dr. Mousa’s emergency medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Mousa agreed to no longer practice emergency medicine.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Nov 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mahrous Mousa to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2023:
 
A College investigation was commenced into Dr. Mousa’s emergency medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Mousa agreed to no longer practice emergency medicine.
 

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Oct 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2021