THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:15:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Central Park Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-0608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Central Park Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-0608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM PHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM PHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2021