THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:28:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: Esan, Comfort Olamide Tosin (Used Until: 04 Jan 2021)
Medical School: Usman Danfodiyo University College of He, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Plains Rd W
West Plain Medical Clinic
Suite 20
Burlington ON L7T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-639-1858
Fax: 905-681-6515
Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Glengate Medical
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Phone: 9056076661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. COMFORT ALARA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Alara (CPSO#: 128089 )
Business Address: 100 Plains Rd W
Suite 20
Burlington ON L7T 0A5
Business Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Unit #6
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4

General Information

Former Name: Esan, Comfort Olamide Tosin (Used Until: 04 Jan 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Usman Danfodiyo University College of He, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Plains Rd W
West Plain Medical Clinic
Suite 20
Burlington ON L7T 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-639-1858
Fax: 905-681-6515
Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Glengate Medical
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Phone: 9056076661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. COMFORT ALARA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Alara (CPSO#: 128089 )
Business Address: 100 Plains Rd W
Suite 20
Burlington ON L7T 0A5
Business Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Unit #6
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COMFORT OLAMIDE ALARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COMFORT OLAMIDE ALARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Usman Danfodiyo University College of He, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2021