THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:33:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Beirut Arab University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Queen Clinic
5025 Creditview Rd
Mississauga ON L5V 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-5555
Fax: 905 286 1237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LINA ZABLOUK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zablouk (CPSO#: 128158 )
Business Address: 4357 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 3J6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Beirut Arab University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Queen Clinic
5025 Creditview Rd
Mississauga ON L5V 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 826-5555
Fax: 905 286 1237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LINA ZABLOUK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zablouk (CPSO#: 128158 )
Business Address: 4357 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 3J6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA MUMTAZ ABDULAHAD ZABLOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABLOUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA MUMTAZ ABDULAHAD ZABLOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZABLOUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Beirut Arab University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021