THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Rabin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rabin (CPSO#: 128209 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-314 Central Park Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Rabin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rabin (CPSO#: 128209 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CARLY PAIGE RABIN may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CARLY PAIGE RABIN may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2021