THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:30:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1535 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8X 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519  915 5520
Fax: 519 915 5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHAZIA NAZIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nazir (CPSO#: 128684 )
Business Address: 70 Augustus Crt
Lasalle ON N9H 0G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1535 Ottawa St
Windsor ON N8X 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519  915 5520
Fax: 519 915 5515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHAZIA NAZIR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nazir (CPSO#: 128684 )
Business Address: 70 Augustus Crt
Lasalle ON N9H 0G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA NAZIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAZIA NAZIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAZIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 17 Jul 2025