THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 744 Richmond Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 996 2727
Fax: 226 996 2728

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR MICHAEL NNAMDI OKOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Okoye (CPSO#: 128735 )
Business Address: 744 Richmond Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J5
2269962727
Business Address: 5193500175
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 744 Richmond Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 996 2727
Fax: 226 996 2728

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR MICHAEL NNAMDI OKOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Okoye (CPSO#: 128735 )
Business Address: 744 Richmond Street
Chatham Ontario N7M 5J5
2269962727
Business Address: 5193500175
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NNAMDI OKOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKOYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NNAMDI OKOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKOYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2024