THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:43:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BELLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. BELLA (CPSO#: 129417 ) Dr. O. Abe (CPSO#: 128761 )
Business Address: 1221 Greenbank Rd
Ottawa ON K2J 5V7
6132588710

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BELLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. BELLA (CPSO#: 129417 ) Dr. O. Abe (CPSO#: 128761 )
Business Address: 1221 Greenbank Rd
Ottawa ON K2J 5V7
6132588710

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOTOMILOLA ANNE-MARY ABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMOTOMILOLA ANNE-MARY ABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2021