THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:38:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College St
Toronto ON M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C Zrenner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College St
Toronto ON M5T 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C Zrenner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Sep 2021
02 Sep 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 02 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTOPH DANIEL FREDERIK ZRENNER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Neurosciences and Clinical Translation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ZRENNER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ZRENNER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ZRENNER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ZRENNER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 September, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 02 September, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHRISTOPH DANIEL FREDERIK ZRENNER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of Neurosciences and Clinical Translation, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ZRENNER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ZRENNER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ZRENNER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ZRENNER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 September, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 02 September, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Eberhard Karls University at Tubingen, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 02 Sep 2028