THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Owolabi, Rashidat (Used Until: 05 Jun 2023)
Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1440 Bathurst Street
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166545437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Owolabi, Rashidat (Used Until: 05 Jun 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1440 Bathurst Street
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166545437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 31 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RASHIDAT OLUWATOYIN OWOLABI-ADEDOKUN may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RASHIDAT OLUWATOYIN OWOLABI-ADEDOKUN may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ghana Medical School, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2023