THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Montpelier St
Intrepid Medical Centre and Walk-in Clinic – Brampton
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARILIA NEUBERT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Neubert (CPSO#: 129009 )
Business Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
289-401-4678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Montpelier St
Intrepid Medical Centre and Walk-in Clinic – Brampton
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. MARILIA NEUBERT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Neubert (CPSO#: 129009 )
Business Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
289-401-4678

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARILIA VENESSA NEUBERT may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARILIA VENESSA NEUBERT may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 14 Feb 2026