THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:19:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 1-1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076223995
Fax: 8883553003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARTIN GAGLIARDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagliardi (CPSO#: 129024 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 1-1077 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076223995
Fax: 8883553003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARTIN GAGLIARDI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagliardi (CPSO#: 129024 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Oct 2023
30 Jun 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 11 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARTIN JULIAN GAGLIARDI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Clinical Sciences Division, the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. GAGLIARDI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GAGLIARDI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GAGLIARDI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GAGLIARDI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 11 October, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. GAGLIARDI's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARTIN JULIAN GAGLIARDI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Clinical Sciences Division, the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. GAGLIARDI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GAGLIARDI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GAGLIARDI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GAGLIARDI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 11 October, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. GAGLIARDI's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021