THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:31:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maulana Azad Medical College, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABHENIL MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mittal (CPSO#: 129048 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Maulana Azad Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABHENIL MITTAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mittal (CPSO#: 129048 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Sep 2023
27 Apr 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 27 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ABHENIL MITTAL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Clinical Sciences Division, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. MITTAL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MITTAL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MITTAL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MITTAL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 27 April, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MITTAL's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ABHENIL MITTAL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Clinical Sciences Division, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. MITTAL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MITTAL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MITTAL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MITTAL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 September, 2023, and expires on 27 April, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MITTAL's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maulana Azad Medical College, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Apr 2030

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021