THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2537 Hamilton Regional Rd 56
Binbrook ON LOR 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-692-2580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All patients are priorly seen at Health Wise Clinic from October 12th, 2021 - February 23rd, 2022  located at #2-15 Lockport Way, Stoney Creek. L8E 0H8 location can access these records directly in person at the address location or via telephone by calling (905)-643-5050 or (905)-309-4646. location is 264 Main St E, Grimsby, ON L3M 1P8. Phone: 905-309-4646. Health Wise Clinic is still operating under new owners, but will be accessible for walk-in services and continued care as needed.

Date Received: 01 Feb 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. MARBINA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marbina (CPSO#: 129101 )
Business Address: 2-15 Lockport Way
Stoney Creek ON L8E 0H8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2537 Hamilton Regional Rd 56
Binbrook ON LOR 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-692-2580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: All patients are priorly seen at Health Wise Clinic from October 12th, 2021 - February 23rd, 2022  located at #2-15 Lockport Way, Stoney Creek. L8E 0H8 location can access these records directly in person at the address location or via telephone by calling (905)-643-5050 or (905)-309-4646. location is 264 Main St E, Grimsby, ON L3M 1P8. Phone: 905-309-4646. Health Wise Clinic is still operating under new owners, but will be accessible for walk-in services and continued care as needed.

Date Received: 01 Feb 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. MARBINA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marbina (CPSO#: 129101 )
Business Address: 2-15 Lockport Way
Stoney Creek ON L8E 0H8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MARBINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARBINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MARBINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARBINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021