THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166150000
Fax: 4166152600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: s.gobalasuthanthiran medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gobalasuthanthiran (CPSO#: 129208 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
suite 215
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
4166150000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166150000
Fax: 4166152600

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: s.gobalasuthanthiran medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gobalasuthanthiran (CPSO#: 129208 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
suite 215
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
4166150000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAKESNAN GOBALASUTHANTHIRAN may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAKESNAN GOBALASUTHANTHIRAN may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021