THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine
B309
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 16413
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine
B309
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 16413
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jan 2025
31 Dec 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Dec 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN FRANCISCO MORALES SANTELICES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MORALES SANTELICES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MORALES SANTELICES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MORALES SANTELICES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MORALES SANTELICES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2025, and expires on 31 December, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MORALES SANTELICES's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN FRANCISCO MORALES SANTELICES may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. MORALES SANTELICES holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MORALES SANTELICES no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MORALES SANTELICES’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MORALES SANTELICES’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 January, 2025, and expires on 31 December, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. MORALES SANTELICES's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2021