THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:28:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 King St W
Integra Health Centre
Suite 1320
Toronto ON M5X 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: 9054556464
Fax: 1-8662659976
Address: 700 Priestman St
Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital
Fredericton NB E3B 5N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FARAH VAYANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vayani (CPSO#: 129326 )
Business Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 King St W
Integra Health Centre
Suite 1320
Toronto ON M5X 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: 9054556464
Fax: 1-8662659976
Address: 700 Priestman St
Dr. Everett Chalmers Hospital
Fredericton NB E3B 5N5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FARAH VAYANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Vayani (CPSO#: 129326 )
Business Address: 116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH NAZ VAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAYANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARAH NAZ VAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAYANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2021