THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-221 Miller Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 6G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058731001
Fax: 9058736446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMAD AGAIBY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Agaiby (CPSO#: 129403 )
Business Address: 550 Arbutus Way
Mississauga ON L5B 0L8
905 566 4567
Business Address: 9-2275 brittania Road West
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Business Address: 10-5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON L5V 0A5
905 858 3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8-221 Miller Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 6G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058731001
Fax: 9058736446

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMAD AGAIBY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Agaiby (CPSO#: 129403 )
Business Address: 550 Arbutus Way
Mississauga ON L5B 0L8
905 566 4567
Business Address: 9-2275 brittania Road West
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Business Address: 10-5380 Terry Fox Way
Mississauga ON L5V 0A5
905 858 3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD GAIRGAS SHAKER AGAIBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAIBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD GAIRGAS SHAKER AGAIBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAIBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021