THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 19:03:14 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476557076
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOHANNES VON VOPELIUS-FELDT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. von Vopelius-Feldt (CPSO#: 129748 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
Emergency Department
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476557076
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JOHANNES VON VOPELIUS-FELDT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. von Vopelius-Feldt (CPSO#: 129748 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNES VON VOPELIUS-FELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON VOPELIUS-FELDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNES VON VOPELIUS-FELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON VOPELIUS-FELDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Technischen Universität München Fakultät für Medizin, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021