THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:33:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 County Court Boulevard
Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Brampton Ontario L6W 4L2
Phone: 647-805-8695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANJLEEN SAUND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saund (CPSO#: 129881 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 County Court Boulevard
Aroga Lifestyle Medicine
Brampton Ontario L6W 4L2
Phone: 647-805-8695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ANJLEEN SAUND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saund (CPSO#: 129881 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANJLEEN KAUR SAUND may practise medicine independently in primary care, excluding pediatrics and obstetrics and gynecology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANJLEEN KAUR SAUND may practise medicine independently in primary care, excluding pediatrics and obstetrics and gynecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023