THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gunaratnam, Yasothara (Used Until: 19 Apr 2021)
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2826A Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. YASOTHARA MATHURANGAN MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mathurangan (CPSO#: 129901 )
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
416-439-8888

General Information

Former Name: Gunaratnam, Yasothara (Used Until: 19 Apr 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2826A Markham Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 5M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-446-4080
Fax: 416-639-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. YASOTHARA MATHURANGAN MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mathurangan (CPSO#: 129901 )
Business Address: 136 Orton Park Rd
Scarborough ON M1G 3H1
416-439-8888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASOTHARA MATHURANGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHURANGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASOTHARA MATHURANGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHURANGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2021