THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
Phone: 905-533-7800
Fax: 905-533-7801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A Olupitan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olupitan (CPSO#: 129914 )
Business Address: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
905-533-7800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
Phone: 905-533-7800
Fax: 905-533-7801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A Olupitan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olupitan (CPSO#: 129914 )
Business Address: 8 Queen St N
Bolton ON L7E 1C8
905-533-7800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALERO OMOYEMI OLUPITAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUPITAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALERO OMOYEMI OLUPITAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLUPITAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2021