THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 857 Milner Ave
Seena Health Center
Scarborough ON M1B 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-7575
Fax: 416-286-7474
Address: 9390 Woodbine Avenue
Unit 1E3
King Square Medical Centre
Markham Ontario L6C 0M5
Phone: 905-766-4700
Fax: 647-670-0767
Address: NA-House Calls
Maple
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. WU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wu (CPSO#: 129960 )
Business Address: 857 Milner Avenue
Seena Health Center
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N6
416-284-7575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 857 Milner Ave
Seena Health Center
Scarborough ON M1B 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-7575
Fax: 416-286-7474
Address: 9390 Woodbine Avenue
Unit 1E3
King Square Medical Centre
Markham Ontario L6C 0M5
Phone: 905-766-4700
Fax: 647-670-0767
Address: NA-House Calls
Maple
Phone: 647-497-7453
Fax: 888-745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. P. WU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wu (CPSO#: 129960 )
Business Address: 857 Milner Avenue
Seena Health Center
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N6
416-284-7575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEARSON WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEARSON WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2021