THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: 519-426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Awadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Awadi (CPSO#: 129973 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West St
Simcoe ON N3Y 1T7
Phone: 519-426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Awadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Awadi (CPSO#: 129973 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD AL-AWADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AWADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMAD AL-AWADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AWADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2022