THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:16:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurosurgery
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472039489
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Neurosurgery
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472039489
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARLO MIGUEL PEDRO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PEDRO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PEDRO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEDRO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEDRO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PEDRO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PEDRO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARLO MIGUEL PEDRO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PEDRO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PEDRO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEDRO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEDRO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PEDRO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PEDRO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
02 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Jan 2025 to 01 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Nov 2024 to 06 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Aug 2024 to 06 Nov 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 06 Aug 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
07 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 02 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Jan 2025 to 01 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Nov 2024 to 06 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Aug 2024 to 06 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 06 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 07 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2021