THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:00:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 16478848211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-225 Richmond St W
Maple Clinic - House Calls
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Mcintyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIntyre (CPSO#: 130175 )
Business Address: 7700 Hurontario St
Unit 503
# 2014
Brampton ON L6Y 4M3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 16478848211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201-225 Richmond St W
Maple Clinic - House Calls
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Mcintyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIntyre (CPSO#: 130175 )
Business Address: 7700 Hurontario St
Unit 503
# 2014
Brampton ON L6Y 4M3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CRAIG MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CRAIG MCINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021