THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4555 Hurontario St
Unit C-7,
Marketplace Medical
Mississauga ON L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-507-4300
Fax: 905-507-4308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. RAMKISSOON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ramkissoon (CPSO#: 130180 )
Business Address: 4555 Hurontario Street
Unit C-7
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4555 Hurontario St
Unit C-7,
Marketplace Medical
Mississauga ON L4Z 3M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-507-4300
Fax: 905-507-4308

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. RAMKISSOON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ramkissoon (CPSO#: 130180 )
Business Address: 4555 Hurontario Street
Unit C-7
Mississauga Ontario L4Z 3M1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAYE ELAINE RAMKISSOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMKISSOON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAYE ELAINE RAMKISSOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMKISSOON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021