THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamia University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: (647) 372-0365
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran Suliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Suliman (CPSO#: 130189 )
Business Address: 987 Sonoma Court
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P4
7802639999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamia University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Stuart St
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: (647) 372-0365
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Imran Suliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Suliman (CPSO#: 130189 )
Business Address: 987 Sonoma Court
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2P4
7802639999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD IMRAN SULIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD IMRAN SULIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamia University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021