THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Grist Mill Road
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 1M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-600-3600
Fax: 289-764-1666
Address: 555 William Graham Drive
Unit 29
Aurora Ontario L4G 7C4
Phone: 905-505-6555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.BALASURIYA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 130361 )
Business Address: 10425 Kennedy Rd
Suite 204
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
(905) 846-3777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 45 Grist Mill Road
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 1M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-600-3600
Fax: 289-764-1666
Address: 555 William Graham Drive
Unit 29
Aurora Ontario L4G 7C4
Phone: 905-505-6555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.BALASURIYA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Balasuriya (CPSO#: 130361 )
Business Address: 10425 Kennedy Rd
Suite 204
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
(905) 846-3777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHAL BALASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASURIYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHAL BALASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASURIYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2021